Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01234 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 31, 2023
Fiscal Note May 30, 2023
Fiscal Note May 24, 2023
Fiscal Note May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note May 3, 2023
Bill March 15, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 30, 2023
Bill May 3, 2023
Analysis May 3, 2023