House | 06/04/2024 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/28/2024 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/28/2024 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/20/2024 | Public Act 24-109 | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | Senate Calendar Number 341 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | File Number 359 | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | House Calendar Number 234 | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/24 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |