House
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Public Act 24-69
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6116
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
File Number 660
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Senate Calendar Number 437
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5170
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
File Number 83
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
House Calendar Number 86
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/24 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Public Hearing 02/28
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|