Connecticut 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05223 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 10, 2024
Fiscal Note May 8, 2024
Fiscal Note May 6, 2024
Fiscal Note May 3, 2024
Fiscal Note May 1, 2024
Fiscal Note March 21, 2024
Bill February 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis July 16, 2024
Analysis May 3, 2024
Analysis May 2, 2024
Analysis March 21, 2024
Bill March 21, 2024

Chaptered

Bill May 17, 2024