Connecticut 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05318 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 29, 2024
Fiscal Note April 26, 2024
Fiscal Note April 24, 2024
Fiscal Note April 18, 2024
Fiscal Note April 10, 2024
Bill February 27, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 29, 2024
Analysis April 26, 2024
Bill April 10, 2024
Analysis April 10, 2024