LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB05337
Draft Versions
CT
Connecticut House Bill HB05337
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2024 Regular Session
Connecticut House Bill HB05337
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
May 2, 2024
Fiscal Note
April 30, 2024
Fiscal Note
April 24, 2024
Fiscal Note
March 20, 2024
Bill
February 27, 2024
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
March 20, 2024
Compare
Analysis
March 20, 2024