House
|
06/06/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Public Act 24-124
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
File Number 623
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Senate Calendar Number 378
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4244
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
File Number 278
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House Calendar Number 195
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/24 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Public Hearing 03/15
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|