Connecticut 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05352 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 29, 2024
Fiscal Note April 26, 2024
Fiscal Note April 23, 2024
Fiscal Note April 12, 2024
Fiscal Note April 4, 2024
Bill February 28, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis July 11, 2024
Analysis April 29, 2024
Analysis April 26, 2024
Bill April 4, 2024
Analysis April 4, 2024

Chaptered

Bill May 22, 2024