24 | 31 | | biological sources, (vi) thermal electric direct energy conversion from a 8 |
---|
25 | 32 | | certified Class I renewable energy source, (vii) ocean thermal power, 9 |
---|
26 | 33 | | (viii) wave or tidal power, (ix) low emission advanced renewable energy 10 |
---|
27 | 34 | | conversion technologies, including, but not limited to, zero emission 11 |
---|
28 | 35 | | low grade heat power generation systems based on organic oil free 12 |
---|
29 | 36 | | rankine, kalina or other similar nonsteam cycles that use waste heat 13 |
---|
30 | 37 | | from an industrial or commercial process that does not generate 14 |
---|
40 | 48 | | including state dam safety requirements and applicable site-specific 20 |
---|
41 | 49 | | standards for water quality and fish passage, or (II) a run-of-the-river 21 |
---|
42 | 50 | | hydropower facility that received a new license after January 1, 2018, 22 |
---|
43 | 51 | | under the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission rules pursuant to 18 23 |
---|
44 | 52 | | CFR 16, as amended from time to time, is not based on a new dam or a 24 |
---|
45 | 53 | | dam identified by the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental 25 |
---|
46 | 54 | | Protection as a candidate for removal, and meets applicable state and 26 |
---|
47 | 55 | | federal requirements, including state dam safety requirements and 27 |
---|
48 | | - | applicable site-specific standards for water quality and fish passage,] 28 |
---|
49 | | - | (xi) a biomass facility that uses sustainable biomass fuel and has an 29 |
---|
50 | | - | average emission rate of equal to or less than .075 pounds of nitrogen 30 |
---|
51 | | - | oxides per million BTU of heat input for the previous calendar quarter, 31 |
---|
52 | | - | except that energy derived from a biomass facility with a capacity of less 32 |
---|
53 | | - | than five hundred kilowatts that began construction before July 1, 2003, 33 |
---|
54 | | - | may be considered a Class I renewable energy source, or (xii) a nuclear 34 |
---|
55 | | - | power generating facility, [constructed on or after October 1, 2023,] or 35 |
---|
56 | | - | (B) any electrical generation, including distributed generation, 36 |
---|
57 | | - | generated from a Class I renewable energy source, provided, on and 37 |
---|
58 | | - | after January 1, 2014, any megawatt hours of electricity from a 38 |
---|
59 | | - | renewable energy source described under this subparagraph that are 39 |
---|
60 | | - | claimed or counted by a load-serving entity, province or state toward 40 |
---|
61 | | - | compliance with renewable portfolio standards or renewable energy 41 |
---|
62 | | - | policy goals in another province or state, other than the state of 42 |
---|
63 | | - | Connecticut, shall not be eligible for compliance with the renewable 43 |
---|
64 | | - | portfolio standards established pursuant to section 16-245a; 44 |
---|
| 56 | + | applicable site-specific standards for water quality and fish passage, (xi) 28 |
---|
| 57 | + | a biomass facility that uses sustainable biomass fuel and has an average 29 |
---|
| 58 | + | emission rate of equal to or less than .075 pounds of nitrogen oxides per 30 |
---|
| 59 | + | million BTU of heat input for the previous calendar quarter, except that 31 |
---|
| 60 | + | energy derived from a biomass facility with a capacity of less than five 32 |
---|
| 61 | + | hundred kilowatts that began construction before July 1, 2003, may be 33 |
---|
| 62 | + | considered a Class I renewable energy source, or (xii) a nuclear power 34 |
---|
| 63 | + | generating facility constructed on or after October 1, 2023, or (B) any 35 |
---|
| 64 | + | electrical generation, including distributed generation, generated from 36 |
---|
| 65 | + | a Class I renewable energy source, provided, on and after January 1, 37 |
---|
| 66 | + | 2014, any megawatt hours of electricity from a renewable energy source 38 |
---|
| 67 | + | described under this subparagraph that are claimed or counted by a 39 |
---|
| 68 | + | load-serving entity, province or state toward compliance with 40 |
---|
| 69 | + | renewable portfolio standards or renewable energy policy goals in 41 |
---|
| 70 | + | another province or state, other than the state of Connecticut, shall not 42 |
---|
| 71 | + | be eligible for compliance with the renewable portfolio standards 43 |
---|
| 72 | + | established pursuant to section 16-245a; 44 |
---|
78 | 87 | | shall be obtained from Class III sources. On and after January 1, 2008, 54 |
---|
79 | 88 | | not less than two per cent of the total output of any such supplier or 55 |
---|
80 | 89 | | such standard service of an electric distribution company shall, on 56 |
---|
81 | 90 | | demonstration satisfactory to the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority, 57 |
---|
82 | 91 | | be obtained from Class III sources. On or after January 1, 2009, not less 58 |
---|
83 | 92 | | than three per cent of the total output of any such supplier or such 59 |
---|
84 | 93 | | standard service of an electric distribution company shall, on 60 |
---|
85 | 94 | | demonstration satisfactory to the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority, 61 |
---|
86 | 95 | | be obtained from Class III sources. On and after January 1, 2010, not less 62 |
---|
87 | 96 | | than four per cent of the total output of any such supplier or such 63 |
---|
88 | 97 | | standard service of an electric distribution company shall, on 64 |
---|
89 | 98 | | demonstration satisfactory to the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority, 65 |
---|
90 | 99 | | be obtained from Class III sources. On and after January 1, 2022, [until 66 |
---|
91 | 100 | | December 31, 2024,] not less than five per cent of the total output of any 67 |
---|
92 | 101 | | such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution 68 |
---|
93 | 102 | | company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Public Utilities 69 |
---|
94 | 103 | | Regulatory Authority, be obtained from Class III sources. Electric power 70 |
---|
95 | 104 | | obtained from customer-side distributed resources that does not meet 71 |
---|
96 | 105 | | air and water quality standards of the Department of Energy and 72 |
---|
97 | 106 | | Environmental Protection is not eligible for purposes of meeting the 73 |
---|
98 | 107 | | percentage standards in this section. 74 |
---|
99 | | - | Sec. 3. (Effective from passage) The Commissioner of Energy and 75 |
---|
100 | | - | Environmental Protection shall study natural gas capacity in the state. 76 |
---|
101 | | - | Such study shall include, but need not be limited to: (1) An evaluation 77 |
---|
102 | | - | of natural gas capacity in the state; and (2) an examination of ways to 78 |
---|
103 | | - | expand natural gas capacity, including any necessary regulatory or 79 |
---|
104 | | - | legislative changes. Not later than January 1, 2025, the commissioner 80 |
---|
105 | | - | shall report, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the 81 |
---|
106 | | - | general statutes, the results of the study, including any 82 |
---|
107 | | - | recommendations, to the joint standing committee of the General 83 |
---|
108 | | - | Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to energy and 84 |
---|
109 | | - | technology. 85 Substitute Bill No. 5356 |
---|
110 | | - | |
---|
111 | | - | |
---|
112 | | - | LCO 4 of 4 |
---|
113 | | - | |
---|