Connecticut 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05356 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 6, 2024
Fiscal Note April 30, 2024
Fiscal Note April 29, 2024
Fiscal Note April 9, 2024
Bill February 28, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 9, 2024
Analysis April 9, 2024