House | 06/05/2024 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/30/2024 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/30/2024 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Public Act 24-128 | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | Senate Calendar Number 472 | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 05/07/2024 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | File Number 288 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | House Calendar Number 205 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/24 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Public Hearing 03/08 | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |