Senate | 04/22/2024 | Senate Calendar Number 336 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | File Number 412 | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | House Calendar Number 268 | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/24 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Public Hearing 03/08 | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |