Senate | 05/03/2024 | Senate Calendar Number 447 | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 05/03/2024 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/03/2024 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5398 | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | File Number 514 | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | House Calendar Number 352 | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/24 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |