Connecticut 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05411 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 7, 2024
Fiscal Note May 6, 2024
Fiscal Note May 4, 2024
Fiscal Note May 2, 2024
Fiscal Note April 16, 2024
Bill February 29, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis May 5, 2024
Analysis April 16, 2024
Bill April 16, 2024