Senate | 04/19/2024 | File Number 569 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2024 | Senate Calendar Number 329 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3875 | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | File Number 453 | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | House Calendar Number 297 | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/24 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Public Hearing 03/20 | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |