Senate | 05/08/2024 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6136 | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | File Number 545 | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | House Calendar Number 371 | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/24 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | Public Hearing 03/28 | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |