Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Public Act 24-74
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
House Calendar Number 462
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5277
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
File Number 201
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Senate Calendar Number 147
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/24 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Public Hearing 03/11
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|