Connecticut 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00109 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 17, 2024
Fiscal Note March 14, 2024
Bill February 13, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis July 18, 2024
Analysis April 19, 2024
Bill March 14, 2024
Analysis March 14, 2024

Chaptered

Bill May 17, 2024