Senate | 04/17/2024 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | File Number 7 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Senate Calendar Number 26 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/24 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |