Connecticut 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00125 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 19, 2024
Fiscal Note April 18, 2024
Fiscal Note April 17, 2024
Fiscal Note March 12, 2024
Bill February 14, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill March 12, 2024
Analysis March 12, 2024