Connecticut 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00266 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33 LCO No. 1869 1 of 4
44
55 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 266
66 February Session, 2024
77 LCO No. 1869
88
99
1010 Referred to Committee on HOUSING
1111
1212
1313 Introduced by:
1414 (HSG)
1515
1616
1717
1818
1919 AN ACT INCREASING THE CONVEYANCE TAX FOR CERTAIN HOME
2020 SALES.
2121 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General
2222 Assembly convened:
2323
2424 Section 1. Section 12-494 of the 2024 supplement to the general 1
2525 statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof 2
2626 (Effective October 1, 2024): 3
2727 (a) There is imposed a tax on each deed, instrument or writing, 4
2828 whereby any lands, tenements or other realty is granted, assigned, 5
2929 transferred or otherwise conveyed to, or vested in, the purchaser, or any 6
3030 other person by such purchaser's direction, when the consideration for 7
3131 the interest or property conveyed equals or exceeds two thousand 8
3232 dollars: 9
3333 (1) Subject to the provisions of [subsection (b)] subsections (b) and (c) 10
3434 of this section, at the rate of three-quarters of one per cent of the 11
3535 consideration for the interest in real property conveyed by such deed, 12
3636 instrument or writing, the revenue from which shall be remitted by the 13
3737 town clerk of the municipality in which such tax is paid, not later than 14
3838 ten days following receipt thereof, to the Commissioner of Revenue 15 Raised Bill No. 266
3939
4040
4141
4242 LCO No. 1869 2 of 4
4343
4444 Services for deposit to the credit of the state General Fund; and 16
4545 (2) At the rate of one-fourth of one per cent of the consideration for 17
4646 the interest in real property conveyed by such deed, instrument or 18
4747 writing, provided the amount imposed under this subdivision shall 19
4848 become part of the general revenue of the municipality in accordance 20
4949 with section 12-499. 21
5050 (b) The rate of tax imposed under subdivision (1) of subsection (a) of 22
5151 this section shall, in lieu of the rate under said subdivision (1), be 23
5252 imposed on certain conveyances as follows: 24
5353 (1) In the case of any conveyance of real property which at the time 25
5454 of such conveyance is used for any purpose other than residential use, 26
5555 except unimproved land, the tax under said subdivision (1) shall be 27
5656 imposed at the rate of one and one-quarter per cent of the consideration 28
5757 for the interest in real property conveyed. For the purposes of this 29
5858 subdivision, "unimproved land" includes land designated as farm, 30
5959 forest or open space land; 31
6060 (2) [In] Except as provided in subsection (c) of this section, in the case 32
6161 of any conveyance in which the real property conveyed is a residential 33
6262 estate, including a primary dwelling and any auxiliary housing or 34
6363 structures, regardless of the number of deeds, instruments or writings 35
6464 used to convey such residential real estate, for which the consideration 36
6565 or aggregate consideration, as the case may be, in such conveyance is 37
6666 eight hundred thousand dollars or more, the tax under said subdivision 38
6767 (1) shall be imposed: 39
6868 (A) At the rate of three-quarters of one per cent on that portion of 40
6969 such consideration up to and including the amount of eight hundred 41
7070 thousand dollars; 42
7171 (B) Prior to July 1, 2020, at the rate of one and one-quarter per cent on 43
7272 that portion of such consideration in excess of eight hundred thousand 44
7373 dollars; and 45 Raised Bill No. 266
7474
7575
7676
7777 LCO No. 1869 3 of 4
7878
7979 (C) On and after July 1, 2020, (i) at the rate of one and one-quarter per 46
8080 cent on that portion of such consideration in excess of eight hundred 47
8181 thousand dollars up to and including the amount of two million five 48
8282 hundred thousand dollars, and (ii) at the rate of two and one-quarter 49
8383 per cent on that portion of such consideration in excess of two million 50
8484 five hundred thousand dollars; and 51
8585 (3) In the case of any conveyance in which real property on which 52
8686 mortgage payments have been delinquent for not less than six months 53
8787 is conveyed to a financial institution or its subsidiary that holds such a 54
8888 delinquent mortgage on such property, the tax under said subdivision 55
8989 (1) shall be imposed at the rate of three-quarters of one per cent of the 56
9090 consideration for the interest in real property conveyed. [For the 57
9191 purposes of subdivision (1) of this subsection, "unimproved land" 58
9292 includes land designated as farm, forest or open space land.] 59
9393 (c) On and after October 1, 2024, for a purchaser that is not an 60
9494 individual, in the case of any conveyance in which the real property 61
9595 conveyed is residential real estate, regardless of the number of deeds, 62
9696 instruments or writings used to convey such residential real estate, in 63
9797 lieu of the rate under subdivision (1) of subsection (a) of this section or 64
9898 subdivision (2) of subsection (b) of this section, the rate of tax imposed 65
9999 on such purchaser of the real property shall be: 66
100100 (1) At the rate of one and three-quarters per cent on that portion of 67
101101 such consideration up to and including the amount of eight hundred 68
102102 thousand dollars; and 69
103103 (2) At the rate of two and one-quarter per cent on that portion of such 70
104104 consideration in excess of eight hundred thousand dollars. 71
105105 [(c)] (d) In addition to the tax imposed under subsection (a) of this 72
106106 section, any targeted investment community, as defined in section 32-73
107107 222, or any municipality in which properties designated as 74
108108 manufacturing plants under section 32-75c are located, may, on or after 75
109109 March 15, 2003, impose an additional tax on each deed, instrument or 76
110110 writing, whereby any lands, tenements or other realty is granted, 77 Raised Bill No. 266
111111
112112
113113
114114 LCO No. 1869 4 of 4
115115
116116 assigned, transferred or otherwise conveyed to, or vested in, the 78
117117 purchaser, or any other person by such purchaser's direction, when the 79
118118 consideration for the interest or property conveyed equals or exceeds 80
119119 two thousand dollars, which additional tax shall be at a rate of up to 81
120120 one-fourth of one per cent of the consideration for the interest in real 82
121121 property conveyed by such deed, instrument or writing. The revenue 83
122122 from such additional tax shall become part of the general revenue of the 84
123123 municipality in accordance with section 12-499. 85
124124 [(d)] (e) On and after July 1, 2025, the Comptroller shall transfer from 86
125125 the General Fund to the Housing Trust Fund established under section 87
126126 8-336o, any revenue received by the state each fiscal year in excess of 88
127127 three hundred million dollars from the tax imposed under subdivision 89
128128 (1) of subsection (a) and subsections (b) [and (c)] to (d), inclusive, of this 90
129129 section. On and after July 1, 2026, the threshold amount in this 91
130130 subsection shall be adjusted annually by the percentage increase in 92
131131 inflation. As used in this subdivision, "increase in inflation" means the 93
132132 increase in the consumer price index for all urban consumers during the 94
133133 preceding calendar year, calculated on a December over December 95
134134 basis, using data reported by the United States Bureau of Labor 96
135135 Statistics. 97
136136 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following
137137 sections:
138138
139139 Section 1 October 1, 2024 12-494
140140
141141 Statement of Purpose:
142142 To increase the state conveyance tax upon residential properties sold to
143143 buyers who are not individuals.
144144 [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except
145145 that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not
146146 underlined.]