Connecticut 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00266 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/27/2024

                               
 
LCO No. 1869  	1 of 4 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 266  
February Session, 2024 
LCO No. 1869 
 
 
Referred to Committee on HOUSING  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(HSG)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT INCREASING THE CONVEYANCE TAX FOR CERTAIN HOME 
SALES. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 12-494 of the 2024 supplement to the general 1 
statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof 2 
(Effective October 1, 2024): 3 
(a) There is imposed a tax on each deed, instrument or writing, 4 
whereby any lands, tenements or other realty is granted, assigned, 5 
transferred or otherwise conveyed to, or vested in, the purchaser, or any 6 
other person by such purchaser's direction, when the consideration for 7 
the interest or property conveyed equals or exceeds two thousand 8 
dollars: 9 
(1) Subject to the provisions of [subsection (b)] subsections (b) and (c) 10 
of this section, at the rate of three-quarters of one per cent of the 11 
consideration for the interest in real property conveyed by such deed, 12 
instrument or writing, the revenue from which shall be remitted by the 13 
town clerk of the municipality in which such tax is paid, not later than 14 
ten days following receipt thereof, to the Commissioner of Revenue 15  Raised Bill No.  266 
 
 
 
LCO No. 1869   	2 of 4 
 
Services for deposit to the credit of the state General Fund; and 16 
(2) At the rate of one-fourth of one per cent of the consideration for 17 
the interest in real property conveyed by such deed, instrument or 18 
writing, provided the amount imposed under this subdivision shall 19 
become part of the general revenue of the municipality in accordance 20 
with section 12-499. 21 
(b) The rate of tax imposed under subdivision (1) of subsection (a) of 22 
this section shall, in lieu of the rate under said subdivision (1), be 23 
imposed on certain conveyances as follows: 24 
(1) In the case of any conveyance of real property which at the time 25 
of such conveyance is used for any purpose other than residential use, 26 
except unimproved land, the tax under said subdivision (1) shall be 27 
imposed at the rate of one and one-quarter per cent of the consideration 28 
for the interest in real property conveyed. For the purposes of this 29 
subdivision, "unimproved land" includes land designated as farm, 30 
forest or open space land; 31 
(2) [In] Except as provided in subsection (c) of this section, in the case 32 
of any conveyance in which the real property conveyed is a residential 33 
estate, including a primary dwelling and any auxiliary housing or 34 
structures, regardless of the number of deeds, instruments or writings 35 
used to convey such residential real estate, for which the consideration 36 
or aggregate consideration, as the case may be, in such conveyance is 37 
eight hundred thousand dollars or more, the tax under said subdivision 38 
(1) shall be imposed: 39 
(A) At the rate of three-quarters of one per cent on that portion of 40 
such consideration up to and including the amount of eight hundred 41 
thousand dollars; 42 
(B) Prior to July 1, 2020, at the rate of one and one-quarter per cent on 43 
that portion of such consideration in excess of eight hundred thousand 44 
dollars; and 45  Raised Bill No.  266 
 
 
 
LCO No. 1869   	3 of 4 
 
(C) On and after July 1, 2020, (i) at the rate of one and one-quarter per 46 
cent on that portion of such consideration in excess of eight hundred 47 
thousand dollars up to and including the amount of two million five 48 
hundred thousand dollars, and (ii) at the rate of two and one-quarter 49 
per cent on that portion of such consideration in excess of two million 50 
five hundred thousand dollars; and 51 
(3) In the case of any conveyance in which real property on which 52 
mortgage payments have been delinquent for not less than six months 53 
is conveyed to a financial institution or its subsidiary that holds such a 54 
delinquent mortgage on such property, the tax under said subdivision 55 
(1) shall be imposed at the rate of three-quarters of one per cent of the 56 
consideration for the interest in real property conveyed. [For the 57 
purposes of subdivision (1) of this subsection, "unimproved land" 58 
includes land designated as farm, forest or open space land.] 59 
(c) On and after October 1, 2024, for a purchaser that is not an 60 
individual, in the case of any conveyance in which the real property 61 
conveyed is residential real estate, regardless of the number of deeds, 62 
instruments or writings used to convey such residential real estate, in 63 
lieu of the rate under subdivision (1) of subsection (a) of this section or 64 
subdivision (2) of subsection (b) of this section, the rate of tax imposed 65 
on such purchaser of the real property shall be: 66 
(1) At the rate of one and three-quarters per cent on that portion of 67 
such consideration up to and including the amount of eight hundred 68 
thousand dollars; and 69 
(2) At the rate of two and one-quarter per cent on that portion of such 70 
consideration in excess of eight hundred thousand dollars. 71 
[(c)] (d) In addition to the tax imposed under subsection (a) of this 72 
section, any targeted investment community, as defined in section 32-73 
222, or any municipality in which properties designated as 74 
manufacturing plants under section 32-75c are located, may, on or after 75 
March 15, 2003, impose an additional tax on each deed, instrument or 76 
writing, whereby any lands, tenements or other realty is granted, 77  Raised Bill No.  266 
 
 
 
LCO No. 1869   	4 of 4 
 
assigned, transferred or otherwise conveyed to, or vested in, the 78 
purchaser, or any other person by such purchaser's direction, when the 79 
consideration for the interest or property conveyed equals or exceeds 80 
two thousand dollars, which additional tax shall be at a rate of up to 81 
one-fourth of one per cent of the consideration for the interest in real 82 
property conveyed by such deed, instrument or writing. The revenue 83 
from such additional tax shall become part of the general revenue of the 84 
municipality in accordance with section 12-499. 85 
[(d)] (e) On and after July 1, 2025, the Comptroller shall transfer from 86 
the General Fund to the Housing Trust Fund established under section 87 
8-336o, any revenue received by the state each fiscal year in excess of 88 
three hundred million dollars from the tax imposed under subdivision 89 
(1) of subsection (a) and subsections (b) [and (c)] to (d), inclusive, of this 90 
section. On and after July 1, 2026, the threshold amount in this 91 
subsection shall be adjusted annually by the percentage increase in 92 
inflation. As used in this subdivision, "increase in inflation" means the 93 
increase in the consumer price index for all urban consumers during the 94 
preceding calendar year, calculated on a December over December 95 
basis, using data reported by the United States Bureau of Labor 96 
Statistics. 97 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 October 1, 2024 12-494 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To increase the state conveyance tax upon residential properties sold to 
buyers who are not individuals. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.]