Connecticut 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00307 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 18, 2024
Fiscal Note April 17, 2024
Fiscal Note April 16, 2024
Fiscal Note April 8, 2024
Bill February 28, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis June 5, 2024
Analysis April 18, 2024
Bill April 8, 2024
Analysis April 8, 2024

Chaptered

Bill May 17, 2024