Senate | 04/04/2024 | File Number 254 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Senate Calendar Number 180 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/24 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |