House | 04/11/2024 | House Calendar Number 329 | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | File Number 263 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Senate Calendar Number 189 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/24 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Public Hearing 03/12 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |