Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Public Act 24-6
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 5288
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Calendar Number 406
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3882
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
File Number 264
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Senate Calendar Number 190
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/24 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Public Hearing 03/14
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
|
|
|