House | 05/08/2024 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6125 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | File Number 396 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | Senate Calendar Number 258 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/24 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/22/2024 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |