Senate | 05/01/2025 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/06/25 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/25/2025 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/21/2025 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/21/2025 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/21/2025 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
Senate | 02/21/2025 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | Vote to Draft |