Senate | 03/11/2025 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | Public Hearing 02/06 | ||
Senate | 01/29/2025 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |