Senate | 02/27/2025 | File Number 22 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Senate Calendar Number 52 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/21/2025 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/26/25 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 01/30/2025 | Public Hearing 02/03 | ||
Senate | 01/29/2025 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |