Senate | 05/01/2025 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | File Number 432 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Senate Calendar Number 254 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/25 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/21/2025 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2025 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |