Senate | 05/01/2025 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 7665 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | File Number 379 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Senate Calendar Number 230 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/25 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Public Hearing 03/06 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |