House | 04/16/2025 | House Calendar Number 459 | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | File Number 433 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Senate Calendar Number 255 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/25 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |