Connecticut 2025 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01538 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11
22
3-LCO 1 of 3
3+LCO No. 6423 1 of 2
44
5-General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 1538
5+General Assembly Raised Bill No. 1538
66 January Session, 2025
7+LCO No. 6423
78
9+
10+Referred to Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH
11+
12+
13+Introduced by:
14+(PH)
815
916
1017
1118
1219 AN ACT CONCERNING EMERGENCY DEPARTMENT BOARDING
1320 AND CROWDING.
1421 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General
1522 Assembly convened:
1623
1724 Section 1. (Effective from passage) The Probate Court Administrator 1
1825 and the Commissioner of Social Services shall evaluate the feasibility of 2
1926 establishing an expedited process for the appointment of a conservator 3
2027 for patients of hospital emergency departments who lack the capacity to 4
2128 consent to receive health care services from the hospital to ensure such 5
2229 patients receive such services in a timely fashion and help alleviate 6
2330 emergency department boarding and crowding. Not later than January 7
2431 1, 2026, said administrator and commissioner shall jointly report, in 8
2532 accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, 9
2633 to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having 10
2734 cognizance of matters relating to public health regarding such 11
2835 evaluation and any recommendations for legislation necessary to 12
2936 establish an expedited conservator process for emergency department 13
3037 patients. As used in this section, "emergency department boarding" 14
3138 means holding patients who have been admitted to the hospital after 15
3239 presenting to the emergency department in the emergency department 16
33-while awaiting an inpatient bed. 17
34-Sec. 2. Section 19a-490ii of the general statutes is repealed and the 18
35-following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage): 19 Substitute Bill No. 1538
40+Raised Bill No. 1538
3641
3742
38-LCO 2 of 3
3943
40-(a) Not later than January 1, 2025, and annually thereafter until 20
41-January 1, 2029, each hospital in the state with an emergency 21
42-department shall, and each hospital operated exclusively by the state 22
43-may, directly or in consultation with a hospital association in the state, 23
44-analyze the following data from the previous calendar year concerning 24
45-its emergency department: (1) The number of patients who received 25
46-treatment in the emergency department; (2) the number of emergency 26
47-department patients who were admitted to the hospital; (3) for patients 27
48-admitted to the hospital after presenting to the emergency department, 28
49-the average length of time from the patient's first presentation to the 29
50-emergency department until the patient's admission to the hospital; and 30
51-(4) the percentage of patients who were admitted to the hospital after 31
52-presenting to the emergency department but were transferred to an 32
53-available bed located in a physical location other than the emergency 33
54-department more than four hours after an admitting order for the 34
55-patient was completed. Each such hospital shall utilize such analysis 35
56-with the goals of (A) developing policies or procedures to reduce wait 36
57-times for admission to the hospital after a patient presents to the 37
58-emergency department, (B) informing potential methods to improve 38
59-admission efficiencies, and (C) examining root causes for delays in 39
60-admission times. 40
61-(b) Not later than March 1, 2025, and annually thereafter until March 41
62-1, 2029, each hospital that conducts an analysis pursuant to subsection 42
63-(a) of this section shall submit a report, in accordance with the 43
64-provisions of section 11-4a, to the joint standing committee of the 44
65-General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to public 45
66-health and, not later than March 1, 2026, and annually thereafter until 46
67-March 1, 2029, shall also submit such report to the Commissioners of 47
68-Public Health and Health Strategy, regarding its findings and any 48
69-recommendations for achieving the goals described in subparagraphs 49
70-(A) to (C), inclusive, of subdivision (4) of subsection (a) of this section. 50
44+LCO No. 6423 2 of 2
45+
46+while awaiting an inpatient bed. 17
7147 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following
7248 sections:
73- Substitute Bill No. 1538
74-
75-
76-LCO 3 of 3
7749
7850 Section 1 from passage New section
79-Sec. 2 from passage 19a-490ii
8051
81-Statement of Legislative Commissioners:
82-In Section 2(b), "shall also submit such report" was added for clarity.
52+Statement of Purpose:
53+To require an evaluation of the feasibility of establishing an expedited
54+conservator process for emergency department patients to alleviate
55+emergency department boarding and crowding.
8356
84-PH Joint Favorable Subst.
57+[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except
58+that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not
59+underlined.]
8560