Connecticut 2025 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01538 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/16/2025

                             
 
LCO   	1 of 3 
  
General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 1538  
January Session, 2025 
 
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING EMERGENCY DEPARTMENT BOARDING 
AND CROWDING.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (Effective from passage) The Probate Court Administrator 1 
and the Commissioner of Social Services shall evaluate the feasibility of 2 
establishing an expedited process for the appointment of a conservator 3 
for patients of hospital emergency departments who lack the capacity to 4 
consent to receive health care services from the hospital to ensure such 5 
patients receive such services in a timely fashion and help alleviate 6 
emergency department boarding and crowding. Not later than January 7 
1, 2026, said administrator and commissioner shall jointly report, in 8 
accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, 9 
to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having 10 
cognizance of matters relating to public health regarding such 11 
evaluation and any recommendations for legislation necessary to 12 
establish an expedited conservator process for emergency department 13 
patients. As used in this section, "emergency department boarding" 14 
means holding patients who have been admitted to the hospital after 15 
presenting to the emergency department in the emergency department 16 
while awaiting an inpatient bed. 17 
Sec. 2. Section 19a-490ii of the general statutes is repealed and the 18 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage): 19  Substitute Bill No. 1538 
 
 
LCO     	2 of 3 
 
(a) Not later than January 1, 2025, and annually thereafter until 20 
January 1, 2029, each hospital in the state with an emergency 21 
department shall, and each hospital operated exclusively by the state 22 
may, directly or in consultation with a hospital association in the state, 23 
analyze the following data from the previous calendar year concerning 24 
its emergency department: (1) The number of patients who received 25 
treatment in the emergency department; (2) the number of emergency 26 
department patients who were admitted to the hospital; (3) for patients 27 
admitted to the hospital after presenting to the emergency department, 28 
the average length of time from the patient's first presentation to the 29 
emergency department until the patient's admission to the hospital; and 30 
(4) the percentage of patients who were admitted to the hospital after 31 
presenting to the emergency department but were transferred to an 32 
available bed located in a physical location other than the emergency 33 
department more than four hours after an admitting order for the 34 
patient was completed. Each such hospital shall utilize such analysis 35 
with the goals of (A) developing policies or procedures to reduce wait 36 
times for admission to the hospital after a patient presents to the 37 
emergency department, (B) informing potential methods to improve 38 
admission efficiencies, and (C) examining root causes for delays in 39 
admission times. 40 
(b) Not later than March 1, 2025, and annually thereafter until March 41 
1, 2029, each hospital that conducts an analysis pursuant to subsection 42 
(a) of this section shall submit a report, in accordance with the 43 
provisions of section 11-4a, to the joint standing committee of the 44 
General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to public 45 
health and, not later than March 1, 2026, and annually thereafter until 46 
March 1, 2029, shall also submit such report to the Commissioners of 47 
Public Health and Health Strategy, regarding its findings and any 48 
recommendations for achieving the goals described in subparagraphs 49 
(A) to (C), inclusive, of subdivision (4) of subsection (a) of this section. 50 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
  Substitute Bill No. 1538 
 
 
LCO     	3 of 3 
 
Section 1 from passage New section 
Sec. 2 from passage 19a-490ii 
 
Statement of Legislative Commissioners:   
In Section 2(b), "shall also submit such report" was added for clarity. 
 
PH Joint Favorable Subst.