LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2025 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB01547
Action History
CT
Connecticut Senate Bill SB01547
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2025 Regular Session
Connecticut Senate Bill SB01547
Action History
Senate
05/05/2025
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/12/25 12:00 PM
Senate
04/25/2025
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Senate
04/24/2025
Joint Favorable Substitute
Senate
03/28/2025
Public Hearing 04/03
Senate
03/24/2025
Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations