Connecticut 2025 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01554 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/08/2025

                                 
 
LCO No. 6965  	1 of 4 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 1554  
January Session, 2025 
LCO No. 6965 
 
 
Referred to Committee on FINANCE, REVENUE AND 
BONDING  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(FIN)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE ELIMINATION OF THE PROPERTY TAX 
ON MOTOR VEHICLES AND THE PROVISION OF REIMBURSEMENT 
AND OTHER GRANTS TO MUNICIPALITIES. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective from passage) (a) Commencing in the fiscal 1 
year ending June 30, 2028, and each fiscal year thereafter, the Treasurer 2 
shall transfer revenue received by the state from estimated and final 3 
payments of the personal income tax imposed under chapter 229 of the 4 
general statutes and the affected business entity tax imposed under 5 
section 12-699 of the general statutes, in an amount equal to the 6 
difference between the final threshold amount calculated for the fiscal 7 
year ending June 30, 2027, and the threshold amount under section 4-8 
30a of the general statutes for each fiscal year thereafter, as adjusted. 9 
Such amounts shall be deposited in the municipal offset vehicle expense 10 
account established under subsection (c) of this section. 11 
(b) Commencing in the fiscal year ending June 30, 2028, and each 12 
fiscal year thereafter, whenever the Comptroller certifies through an 13 
annual actuarial valuation for the prior fiscal year that there is a decrease 14     
Raised Bill No.  1554 
 
 
 
LCO No. 6965   	2 of 4 
 
in the necessary budgeted actuarially determined employer 15 
contribution for the applicable fiscal year compared to the amount 16 
determined from the actuarial valuation for the fiscal year ending two 17 
fiscal years prior, the Comptroller shall transfer the amount of such 18 
difference to the municipal offset vehicle expense account established 19 
under subsection (c) of this section. 20 
(c) There is established an account to be known as the "municipal 21 
offset vehicle expense account", which shall be a separate, nonlapsing 22 
account. The account shall contain any moneys required by law to be 23 
deposited in the account. Moneys in the account shall be expended by 24 
the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management for the purpose of 25 
phasing out the property tax on motor vehicles imposed by chapter 203 26 
of the general statutes, disbursing grants to municipalities for the 27 
revenue loss associated with such phase-out and paying grants to 28 
municipalities pursuant to subsection (e) of this section. 29 
(d) The Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management shall begin 30 
the process of reducing the property tax on motor vehicles by 31 
exempting, commencing in the fiscal year ending June 30, 2029, a 32 
portion of the assessed value of a motor vehicle each fiscal year until the 33 
property tax on motor vehicles is reduced to zero and disbursing grants 34 
to municipalities as reimbursement for the revenue loss resulting from 35 
such exempted portion. The secretary shall calculate, for the fiscal year 36 
ending June 30, 2029, and each fiscal year thereafter, (1) the amount of 37 
the portion of the assessed value of a motor vehicle that shall be 38 
exempted, based on the amount projected to be available for 39 
disbursement in the municipal offset vehicle expense account 40 
established under subsection (c) of this section, and (2) the amounts of 41 
the reimbursement grants to be disbursed to each municipality. The 42 
secretary shall notify the chief executive officer of each municipality not 43 
later than September 1, 2027, and each September first thereafter, of the 44 
exemption amount and the grant amount payable to each municipality 45 
pursuant to this subsection. 46     
Raised Bill No.  1554 
 
 
 
LCO No. 6965   	3 of 4 
 
(e) (1) On or before the date the property tax on motor vehicles is 47 
reduced to zero pursuant to subsection (d) of this section, the Secretary 48 
of the Office of Policy and Management shall calculate and post on the 49 
Office of Policy and Management's Internet web site a municipal needs 50 
capacity gap metric for each municipality. Such metric shall be 51 
calculated in accordance with the methodologies used in the May, 2015 52 
New England Public Policy Center Research Report 15-1. 53 
(2) Not later than July fifteenth of the fiscal year in which the property 54 
tax on motor vehicles is reduced to zero pursuant to subsection (d) of 55 
this section, the secretary shall determine the formulae and calculations, 56 
based on the amount available for disbursement in the municipal offset 57 
vehicle expense account established under subsection (c) of this section, 58 
for grants to be paid to municipalities as follows: (A) Fifty per cent of 59 
such amount shall be distributed to municipalities for needs capacity 60 
grants based on a municipality's municipal needs capacity gap metric; 61 
and (B) fifty per cent of such amount shall be distributed to 62 
municipalities on a per capita basis, as determined by the most recent 63 
federal decennial census. 64 
(3) Not later than August first immediately following such July 65 
fifteenth, the secretary shall present such formulae and calculations and 66 
the projected amounts each municipality would receive under 67 
subparagraphs (A) and (B) of subdivision (2) of this subsection to the 68 
joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance 69 
of matters relating to finance, revenue and bonding and local 70 
governments. 71 
(4) Not later than September first of each subsequent year, the 72 
secretary shall calculate the amount of each municipality's grants under 73 
subdivision (2) of this subsection and notify the chief executive officer 74 
of each municipality of the grant amounts payable to such municipality 75 
pursuant to said subdivision. 76 
(f) Commencing in the fiscal year ending June 30, 2028, the Secretary 77     
Raised Bill No.  1554 
 
 
 
LCO No. 6965   	4 of 4 
 
of the Office of Policy and Management shall submit an annual report 78 
to the General Assembly, in accordance with the provisions of section 79 
11-4a of the general statutes, of a summary of the following, as 80 
applicable: (1) The amount in the municipal offset vehicle expense 81 
account established under subsection (c) of this section; (2) for the 82 
applicable fiscal year, the amount of the portion of the assessed value of 83 
a motor vehicle exempted pursuant to subsection (d) of this section and 84 
the amounts of the reimbursement grant provided to each municipality 85 
due to such exemption; (3) information and data related to the grants 86 
under subsection (e) of this section; and (4) any other information the 87 
secretary deems relevant or necessary to any grants disbursed pursuant 88 
to this section. 89 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 from passage New section 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To phase out and eliminate the property tax on motor vehicles through 
the dedication of certain revenue and savings for reimbursement and 
other grants to municipalities. 
 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.]