Senate | 04/09/2025 | File Number 615 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Senate Calendar Number 340 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Public Hearing 03/14 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2025 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/14/2025 | Vote to Draft |