Council | 04/14/2023 | Law L25-0001, Effective from Mar 22, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 004312, Expires on Nov 02, 2023 | ||
Council | 02/10/2023 | Act A25-0005 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 001863 | ||
Council | 02/07/2023 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 02/02/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 02/01/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0005 | ||
Council | 01/25/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 8, 2023 | ||
Council | 01/17/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 01/17/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 01/13/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0002 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 01/03/2023 | First Reading | ||
Council | 01/03/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |