1 | 1 | | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | 1 |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | ____________ |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
11 | 11 | | |
---|
12 | 12 | | ___________________________ |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | |
---|
15 | 15 | | To amend, on an emergency basis, due to congressional review, the Human Rights Act of 1977 |
---|
16 | 16 | | to clarify the available remedies for the Attorney General in the prosecution of certain |
---|
17 | 17 | | civil rights violations. |
---|
18 | 18 | | |
---|
19 | 19 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
20 | 20 | | act may be cited as the “ Attorney General Civil Rights Enforcement Congressional Review |
---|
21 | 21 | | Emergency Amendment Act of 2023” . |
---|
22 | 22 | | |
---|
23 | 23 | | Sec. 2. The Human Rights Act of 1977, effective December 13, 1977 (D.C. Law 2- 38; |
---|
24 | 24 | | D.C. Official Code § 2- 1401.01 et seq .), is amended as follows: |
---|
25 | 25 | | (a) Section 102 (D.C. Official Code § 2- 1401.02) is amended by adding a new paragraph |
---|
26 | 26 | | (2A) to read as follows: |
---|
27 | 27 | | “(2A) “Attorney General” means the Attorney General for the District of |
---|
28 | 28 | | Columbia, as established under section 435 of the Home Rule Act, effective May 28, 2011 (D.C. |
---|
29 | 29 | | Law 18-160A; D.C. Official Code § 1- 204.35).”. |
---|
30 | 30 | | (b) A new section 316a is added to read as follows: |
---|
31 | 31 | | “Sec. 316a. Civil actions by the Attorney General. |
---|
32 | 32 | | “In a civil action initiated by the Attorney General for violations of this act, other than an |
---|
33 | 33 | | action brought under section 307, the Attorney General: |
---|
34 | 34 | | “(1) May obtain: |
---|
35 | 35 | | “(A) Injunctive relief, as described in section 307; |
---|
36 | 36 | | “(B) Civil penalties, up to the amounts described in section 313(a)(1)(E-i), |
---|
37 | 37 | | for each action or practice in violation of this act, and, in the context of a discriminatory |
---|
38 | 38 | | advertisement, for each day the advertisement was posted; and |
---|
39 | 39 | | “(C) Any other form of relief described in section 313(a)(1); and |
---|
40 | 40 | | “(2)(A) May seek subpoenas for the production of documents and materials or for |
---|
41 | 41 | | the attendance and testimony of witnesses under oath, or both, which shall contain the |
---|
42 | 42 | | information described in section 110a(b) of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia |
---|
43 | 43 | | Clarification and Elected Term Amendment Act of 2010, effective October 22, 2015 (D.C. Law |
---|
44 | 44 | | 21-36; D.C. Official Code § 1- 301.88d(b)) (“Act”); and ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
45 | 45 | | |
---|
46 | 46 | | |
---|
47 | 47 | | |
---|
48 | 48 | | 2 |
---|
49 | 49 | | “(B) Shall follow the procedures described in section 110a(c), (d), and (e) |
---|
50 | 50 | | of the Act (D.C. Official Code § 1- 301.88d(c), (d), and (e)); provided, that the subpoenas are not |
---|
51 | 51 | | directed to a District government official or entity.”. |
---|
52 | 52 | | |
---|
53 | 53 | | Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. |
---|
54 | 54 | | The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact |
---|
55 | 55 | | statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved |
---|
56 | 56 | | October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1- 301.47a). |
---|
57 | 57 | | |
---|
58 | 58 | | Sec. 4. Effective date. |
---|
59 | 59 | | This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the |
---|
60 | 60 | | Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than |
---|
61 | 61 | | 90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section |
---|
62 | 62 | | 412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; |
---|
63 | 63 | | D.C. Official Code §1- 204.12(a)). |
---|
64 | 64 | | |
---|
65 | 65 | | |
---|
66 | 66 | | |
---|
67 | 67 | | |
---|
68 | 68 | | ______________________________ |
---|
69 | 69 | | Chairman |
---|
70 | 70 | | Council of the District of Columbia |
---|
71 | 71 | | |
---|
72 | 72 | | |
---|
73 | 73 | | |
---|
74 | 74 | | |
---|
75 | 75 | | _________________________________ |
---|
76 | 76 | | Mayor |
---|
77 | 77 | | District of Columbia |
---|
78 | 78 | | |
---|
79 | 79 | | |
---|