District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0003 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 01/03/2023

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
1 
AN ACT 
 
____________ 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
___________________________ 
 
 
To amend, on an emergency basis, due to congressional review, the Human Rights Act of 1977 
to clarify the available remedies for the Attorney General in the prosecution of certain 
civil rights violations. 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
act may be cited as the “	Attorney General Civil Rights Enforcement Congressional Review 
Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”	. 
 
 Sec. 2.  The Human Rights Act of 1977, effective December 13, 1977 (D.C. Law 2-	38; 
D.C. Official Code § 2-	1401.01 et seq .), is amended as follows:  
 (a) Section 102 (D.C. Official Code § 2-	1401.02) is amended by adding a new paragraph 
(2A) to read as follows:  
 “(2A) “Attorney General” means the Attorney General for the District of 
Columbia, as established under section 435 of the Home Rule Act, effective May 28, 2011 (D.C. 
Law 18-160A; D.C. Official Code § 1-	204.35).”.   
 (b) A new section 316a is added to read as follows:  
 “Sec. 316a. Civil actions by the Attorney General.  
 “In a civil action initiated by the Attorney General for violations of this act, other than an 
action brought under section 307, the Attorney General:  
 “(1) May obtain:  
 “(A) Injunctive relief, as described in section 307;  
 “(B) Civil penalties, up to the amounts described in section 313(a)(1)(E-i), 
for each action or practice in violation of this act, and, in the context of a discriminatory 
advertisement, for each day the advertisement was posted; and 
 “(C) Any other form of relief described in section 313(a)(1); and  
 “(2)(A) May seek subpoenas for the production of documents and materials or for 
the attendance and testimony of witnesses under oath, or both, which shall contain the 
information described in section 110a(b) of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia 
Clarification and Elected Term Amendment Act of 2010, effective October 22, 2015 (D.C. Law 
21-36; D.C. Official Code § 1-	301.88d(b)) (“Act”); and      	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
2 
 “(B) Shall follow the procedures described in section 110a(c), (d), and (e) 
of the Act (D.C. Official Code § 1-	301.88d(c), (d), and (e)); provided, that the subpoenas are not 
directed to a District government official or entity.”.  
 
 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Budget Director as the fiscal impact 
statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, approved 
October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-	301.47a). 
 
 Sec. 4. Effective date. 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 
D.C. Official Code §1-	204.12(a)). 
 
 
 
 
______________________________ 
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
 
 
 
 
_________________________________ 
Mayor 
District of Columbia