Council | 05/03/2024 | Law L25-0158, Effective from Apr 20, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 005017 | ||
Council | 03/11/2024 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 03/08/2024 | Act A25-0407 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 002265 | ||
Council | 03/01/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 03/01/2024 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0407 | ||
Council | 02/15/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 1, 2024 | ||
Council | 02/06/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 01/09/2024 | First Reading, CC | ||
Council | 12/27/2023 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 12/21/2023 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 12/21/2023 | Committee Mark-up of B25-0005 | ||
Council | 10/12/2023 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 09/22/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 09/19/2023 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 01/17/2023 | Referred to Committee on Public Works and Operations | ||
Council | 01/13/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0005 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 01/03/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |