Council | 02/10/2023 | Act A25-0008 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 001871, Expires on May 02, 2023 | ||
Council | 02/02/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 02/01/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0008, Expires on May 02, 2023 | ||
Council | 01/23/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 6, 2023 | ||
Council | 01/17/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 01/17/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 01/11/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |