Council | 04/05/2024 | Law L25-0141, Effective from Mar 23, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 003857 | ||
Council | 02/09/2024 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 02/09/2024 | Act A25-0389 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 001466 | ||
Council | 02/05/2024 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 02/05/2024 | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0389 | ||
Council | 01/22/2024 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 5, 2024 | ||
Council | 01/09/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 01/09/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 12/19/2023 | First Reading, CC | ||
Council | 12/19/2023 | Committee Mark-up of B25-0048 | ||
Council | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole | ||
Council | 01/27/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0048 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 01/19/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |