Council
|
06/07/2024
|
Law L25-0162, Effective from May 21, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 006666
|
|
|
Council
|
04/09/2024
|
Transmitted to Congress
|
|
|
Council
|
03/29/2024
|
Act A25-0427 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 003525
|
|
|
Council
|
03/26/2024
|
Returned from Mayor
|
|
|
Council
|
03/25/2024
|
Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0427
|
|
|
Council
|
03/15/2024
|
Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 29, 2024
|
|
|
Council
|
03/05/2024
|
Allen Oral Amendment
|
|
|
Council
|
03/05/2024
|
Final Reading
|
|
|
Council
|
03/05/2024
|
Motion to Postpone to 4/2/2024 (Nadeau)
|
|
|
Council
|
03/05/2024
|
Mendelson Oral Amendment
|
|
|
Council
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment #3 (Mendelson, Pinto & Bonds)
|
|
|
Council
|
03/05/2024
|
Frumin Oral Amendment
|
|
|
Council
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment #2 (Mendelson, Pinto & Bonds)
|
|
|
Council
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Mendelson, Pinto & Bonds)
|
|
|
Council
|
03/05/2024
|
Agendized; not considered at the request of Frumin
|
|
|
Council
|
02/06/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Council
|
02/06/2024
|
Agendized; not considered at the request of Amendment #2 (Mendelson, Bonds, Pinto)
|
|
|
Council
|
02/06/2024
|
Agendized; not considered at the request of Amendment #1 (Mendelson, Bonds, Pinto)
|
|
|
Council
|
02/06/2024
|
Agendized; not considered at the request of Amendment (Lewis George)
|
|
|
Council
|
02/06/2024
|
Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (McDuffie)
|
|
|
Council
|
01/18/2024
|
Committee Report Filed
|
|
|
Council
|
01/17/2024
|
Committee Mark-up of B25-0056
|
|
|
Council
|
01/16/2024
|
Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
|
|
|
Council
|
06/08/2023
|
Public Hearing Held
|
|
|
Council
|
05/26/2023
|
Public Hearing Held
|
|
|
Council
|
05/19/2023
|
Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
|
|
|
Council
|
05/17/2023
|
Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
|
|
|
Council
|
05/05/2023
|
Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
|
|
|
Council
|
05/03/2023
|
Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
|
|
|
Council
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
|
|
|
Council
|
01/27/2023
|
Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0056 Published in the DC Register
|
|
|
Council
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced in Office of the Secretary
|
|
|