Council | 07/21/2023 | Law L25-0021, Effective from Jul 01, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 009915 | ||
Council | 05/18/2023 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 05/12/2023 | Act A25-0094 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 006762 | ||
Council | 05/08/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 05/04/2023 | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0094 | ||
Council | 04/24/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 8, 2023 | ||
Council | 04/04/2023 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 04/04/2023 | Amendment #2 (Mendelson) | ||
Council | 04/04/2023 | Amendment #1 (Mendelson) | ||
Council | 04/04/2023 | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson, Nadeau, Henderson) | ||
Council | 04/04/2023 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 03/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
Council | 03/07/2023 | Committee Mark-up of B25-0068 | ||
Council | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole | ||
Council | 02/03/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0068 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 01/25/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |