Council | 03/10/2023 | Act A25-0029 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 002963, Expires on May 25, 2023 | ||
Council | 02/28/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 02/24/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0029, Expires on May 25, 2023 | ||
Council | 02/15/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 2, 2023 | ||
Council | 02/07/2023 | Final Reading | ||
Council | 02/07/2023 | Retained by the Council | ||
Council | 02/02/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |