District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0085 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
2-
3-
4-
5-
6-1
7-
8-AN ACT
9-
10-____________
11-
12-IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
13-
14-_________________
15-
16-To amend, on an emergency basis, An Act to revise certain laws relating to the liability of hotels,
17-motels, and similar establishments in the District of Columbia to their guests to authorize
18-the Mayor to issue rules to establish requirements for cleaning and maintenance of hotels
19-and motel rooms, with the exception of certain establishments operating on an “extended
20-stay” model, and to establis h standards for public notice of lodging establishment service
21-disruptions.
22-
23- BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
24-act may be cited as the “Hotel Enhanced Cleaning and Notice of Service Disruption Clarification
25-Emergency Amendment Act of 2023”.
26-
27- Sec. 2. An Act to revise certain laws relating to the liability of hotels, motels, and similar
28-establishments in the District of Columbia to their guests, approved December 8, 1970 (84 Stat.
29-1396; D.C. Official Code § 30- 101 et seq.), is amended by adding a new section 3a to read as
30-follows:
31- “Sec. 3a. Cleaning and maintenance of hotels and motels and public notice of service
32-disruptions.
33- “(a)(1) The Mayor, pursuant to Title I of the District of Columbia Administrative
34-Procedure Act, effective October 21, 1968 (82 Stat. 1204; D.C. Official Code § 2- 501 et seq.),
35-may issue rules to establish requirements for the cleaning and maintenance of hotels, motels, and
36-other lodging establishments (collectively “lodging establishments”) and to establish standards
37-for public notice of actual or potential disruptions to service at, or use or enjoyment of, lodging
38-establishments.
39- “(2) Notwithstanding paragraph (1) of this subsection, a lodging establishment
40-shall not be required to clean guest room s on a daily basis that conta in a kitchen, defined as a
41-cooking facility that includes a permanently affixed cooktop appliance consisting of two or more
42-burners, with or without an oven, with a power supply served by either an electrical connection
43-or a natural gas line, unless specifically requested by a guest.
44- “(b) Civil fines and penalties may be imposed by the Mayor pursuant to the Department
45-of Consumer and Regulatory Affairs Civil Infractions Act of 1985, effective October 5, 1985
46-(D.C. Law 6-42; D.C. Official Code § 2- 1801.01 et seq. ) (“Civil Infractions Act”), for infraction ENROLLED ORIGINAL
47-
48-
49-
50-
51-2
52-
53-of the rules. The adjudication of any such infraction, fine, or penalty shall be pursuant to the
54-Civil Infractions Act.”.
55-
56- Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement.
57- The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal
58-impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975,
59-approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1- 301.47a).
60-
61- Sec. 4. Effective date.
62- This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the
63-Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than
64-90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section
65-412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788;
66-D.C. Official Code §1- 204.12(a)).
67-
68-
69-
70-______________________________
71-Chairman
72-Council of the District of Columbia
73-
74-
75-
76-
77-
78-_________________________________
79-Mayor
80-District of Columbia
81-
82-
83-
84-
1+______________________ 1
2+Councilmember Anita Bonds 2
3+ 3
4+ 4
5+ 5
6+ 6
7+A Bill 7
8+ 8
9+_______ 9
10+ 10
11+IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 11
12+ 12
13+_________________ 13
14+ 14
15+To amend, on an emergency basis, An Act to revise certain laws relating to the liability of hotels, 15
16+motels, and similar establishments in the District of Columbia to their guests to authorize 16
17+the Mayor to issue rules to establish requirements for cleaning and maintenance of hotels 17
18+and motel rooms, with the exception of certain establishments operating on an “extended 18
19+stay” model, and to establish standards for public notice of lodging establishment service 19
20+disruptions. 20
21+ 21
22+ BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 22
23+act may be cited as the “Hotel Enhanced Cleaning and Notice of Service Disruption Emergency 23
24+Amendment Act of 2023”. 24
25+ Sec. 2. An Act to revise certain laws relating to the liability of hotels, motels, and similar 25
26+establishments in the District of Columbia to their guests, approved December 8, 1970 (84 Stat. 26
27+1396; D.C. Law 91-537; D.C. Official Code § 30-101 et seq.) is amended by adding a new 27
28+section 3a to read as follows: 28
29+ “Sec. 3a. Cleaning and maintenance of hotels and motels and public notice of service 29
30+disruptions. 30
31+ “(a) The Mayor, pursuant to Title I of the District of Columbia Administrative Procedure 31
32+Act, effective October 21, 1968 (82 Stat. 1204; D.C. Official Code § 2-501 et seq.), may issue 32
33+rules to establish requirements for the cleaning and maintenance of hotels, motels, and other 33
34+lodging establishments (collectively “lodging establishments”) and to establish standards for 34 public notice of actual or potential disruptions to service at, or use or enjoyment of, lodging 35
35+establishments. 36
36+ “(1) A lodging establishment providing guest rooms that contain a kitchen, 37
37+defined as a cooking facility that includes a permanently affixed cooktop appliance consisting of 38
38+two or more burners, with or without an oven, with a power supply served by either an electrical 39
39+connection or a natural gas line, shall not be required to clean those guest rooms on a daily basis, 40
40+unless specifically requested by a guest. 41
41+ (b) Civil fines and penalties may be imposed by the Mayor pursuant to the Department of 42
42+Consumer and Regulatory Affairs Civil Infractions Act of 1985, effective October 5, 1985 (D.C. 43
43+Law 6-42; D.C. Official Code § 2-1801.01 et seq.) (“Civil Infractions Act”), for infraction of the 44
44+rules. The adjudication of any such infraction, fine, or penalty shall be pursuant to the Civil 45
45+Infractions Act.”. 46
46+ Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 47
47+ The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal 48
48+impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 49
49+approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a). 50
50+ Sec. 4. Effective date. 51
51+ This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 52
52+Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 53
53+90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 54
54+412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 55
55+D.C. Official Code §1-204.12(a)). 56