District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill B25-0085 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/02/2023

                    ______________________ 1 
Councilmember Anita Bonds 2 
 3 
 4 
 5 
 6 
A Bill 7 
 8 
_______ 9 
 10 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 11 
 12 
_________________ 13 
  14 
To amend, on an emergency basis, An Act to revise certain laws relating to the liability of hotels, 15 
motels, and similar establishments in the District of Columbia to their guests to authorize 16 
the Mayor to issue rules to establish requirements for cleaning and maintenance of hotels 17 
and motel rooms, with the exception of certain establishments operating on an “extended 18 
stay” model, and to establish standards for public notice of lodging establishment service 19 
disruptions.  20 
 21 
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 22 
act may be cited as the “Hotel Enhanced Cleaning and Notice of Service Disruption Emergency 23 
Amendment Act of 2023”.  24 
 Sec. 2.  An Act to revise certain laws relating to the liability of hotels, motels, and similar 25 
establishments in the District of Columbia to their guests, approved December 8, 1970 (84 Stat. 26 
1396; D.C. Law 91-537; D.C. Official Code § 30-101 et seq.) is amended by adding a new 27 
section 3a to read as follows: 28 
 “Sec. 3a.  Cleaning and maintenance of hotels and motels and public notice of service 29 
disruptions. 30 
 “(a) The Mayor, pursuant to Title I of the District of Columbia Administrative Procedure 31 
Act, effective October 21, 1968 (82 Stat. 1204; D.C. Official Code § 2-501 et seq.), may issue 32 
rules to establish requirements for the cleaning and maintenance of hotels, motels, and other 33 
lodging establishments (collectively “lodging establishments”) and to establish standards for 34  public notice of actual or potential disruptions to service at, or use or enjoyment of, lodging 35 
establishments.  36 
 “(1) A lodging establishment providing guest rooms that contain a kitchen, 37 
defined as a cooking facility that includes a permanently affixed cooktop appliance consisting of 38 
two or more burners, with or without an oven, with a power supply served by either an electrical 39 
connection or a natural gas line, shall not be required to clean those guest rooms on a daily basis, 40 
unless specifically requested by a guest. 41 
 (b) Civil fines and penalties may be imposed by the Mayor pursuant to the Department of 42 
Consumer and Regulatory Affairs Civil Infractions Act of 1985, effective October 5, 1985 (D.C. 43 
Law 6-42; D.C. Official Code § 2-1801.01 et seq.) (“Civil Infractions Act”), for infraction of the 44 
rules.  The adjudication of any such infraction, fine, or penalty shall be pursuant to the Civil 45 
Infractions Act.”.    46 
 Sec. 3. Fiscal impact statement. 47 
 The Council adopts the fiscal impact statement of the Chief Financial Officer as the fiscal 48 
impact statement required by section 4a of the General Legislative Procedures Act of 1975, 49 
approved October 16, 2006 (120 Stat. 2038; D.C. Official Code § 1-301.47a).  50 
 Sec. 4. Effective date. 51 
 This act shall take effect following approval by the Mayor (or in the event of veto by the 52 
Mayor, action by the Council to override the veto), and shall remain in effect for no longer than 53 
90 days, as provided for emergency acts of the Council of the District of Columbia in section 54 
412(a) of the District of Columbia Home Rule Act, approved December 24, 1973 (87 Stat. 788; 55 
D.C. Official Code §1-204.12(a)). 56