Council | 01/05/2024 | Law L25-0086, Effective from Dec 20, 2023 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 000001 | ||
Council | 11/06/2023 | Transmitted to Congress | ||
Council | 11/03/2023 | Act A25-0282 Published in DC Register Vol 70 and Page 014494 | ||
Council | 10/31/2023 | Returned from Mayor | ||
Council | 10/30/2023 | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0282 | ||
Council | 10/19/2023 | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 2, 2023 | ||
Council | 10/03/2023 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 09/27/2023 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 09/19/2023 | First Reading, CC | ||
Council | 09/19/2023 | Committee Mark-up of B25-0118 | ||
Council | 02/10/2023 | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0118 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole | ||
Council | 02/02/2023 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |